ST JOSEPHS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (SALE)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Indoor and Outdoor Continuous Provision of Play. Care and Education of children aged between 2yrs 6mnths to 4+ FundraIsing activities for all families & friends. A fun, safe and secure provision
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Trafford
Governance
- 03 October 1995: Standard registration
- 27 February 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 27 February 2015: Funds transferred to 1105262 ST. JOSEPH'S SCHOOL PTA, SALE
- ST JOSEPH'S PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- ST JOSEPH'S PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- ST JOSEPH'S PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Working name)
- ST JOSEPHS PLAYGROUP SALE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2009 | 31/07/2010 | 31/07/2011 | 31/07/2012 | 31/07/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.12k | £69.40k | £71.44k | £96.48k | £85.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.92k | £68.06k | £82.89k | £76.72k | £104.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | 22 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | 22 May 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2012 | 10 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2012 | 12 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 04 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | 07 November 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 1983 AS RATIFIED 4 JULY 1995 AS AMENDED 18 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window