PHOENIX INFANT SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1049593
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROVIDE PHOENIX CHILDREN WITH A WIDE RANGE OF EDUCATIONAL POSSIBILITIES AND TO ACHIEVE THEIR POTENTIAL TO PROVIDE PARENTS WITH SUPPORT OUTSIDE AND WITHIN THE SCHOOL ENVIRONMENT. TO PROVIDE HEALTH AND SAFETY. TO OFFER A WIDE RANGE OF OPPORTUNITIES

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,845
Total expenditure: £4,301

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 October 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID COLYER Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
LISA HARPER Trustee 01 September 2008
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.68k £7.32k £9.64k £11.00k £5.85k
Total expenditure £7.25k £555 £907 £4.13k £4.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 May 2024 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PHOENIX INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL
PHOENIX AVENUE
GEDLING
NOTTINGHAM
NG4 4EL
Phone:
01159539927