MADELEY PRACTICE PATIENTS FUND

Charity number: 1049612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising to purchase medical equipment and supplies not normally provided by the National Health Service and to advance the education of patients of the Madeley Practice on health and healthcare issues.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £2,931
Total expenditure: £2,946

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 October 1995: Standard registration
  • 16 February 2022: Funds received from 1087999 MADELEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN PATRICIA KELLER Trustee 06 November 2024
None on record
SUSAN BETTY ALCOCK Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
RICHARD LATHAM Trustee 24 November 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.91k £8.36k £3.22k £4.41k £2.93k
Total expenditure £2.96k £2.82k £8.51k £7.96k £2.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MOSS LANE SURGERY
MOSS LANE
MADELEY
CREWE
CW3 9NQ
Phone:
01782750274
Website:

No information available