Financial history BRENT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX

Charity Number: 1049632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £1.33m £1.24m £1.13m £784.54k £767.11k
Total expenditure £1.11m £1.16m £1.15m £769.52k £865.97k
Income from government contracts £514.40k £502.26k £497.26k N/A £530.70k
Income from government grants £7.35k £502.26k N/A £493.27k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.32m £1.22m £1.10m £1.12k £1.09k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £780.05k £224.12k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.45k £1.34k £3.54k £2.28k £11.31k
Income - Other £0 £18.54k £21.92k £1.10k £556
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.11m £1.16m £1.15m £769.52k £865.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £7.20k £7.20k £48.49k £131.63k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0