Trustees BRENT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX

Charity Number: 1049632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Johnston Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Pierrick Roger Trustee 01 March 2025
None on record
Christine Fogg Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Julie Hawkins Trustee 01 August 2024
None on record
Florence Rankin Trustee 17 January 2024
STATE2BAR
Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
David Boxall Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Frances Hutchinson Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Robert Simon Roscoe Trustee 25 February 2020
None on record
Helen Glasson Trustee 26 November 2018
LONDON CITIZENS ADVICE LTD
Recently registered
Louisa Martin Trustee 25 September 2017
None on record