SOUTHCOTT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1049649
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

school fund raising

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £13,876
Total expenditure: £13,662

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 October 1995: Standard registration
  • 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 05 June 2011: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Blount Chair 07 September 2018
None on record
Holly Danielle Byrne Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £14.11k £10.53k £5.54k £10.05k £13.88k
Total expenditure £11.81k £10.05k £4.69k £14.49k £13.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 02 July 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Southcott Lower School
Bideford Green
LEIGHTON BUZZARD
Bedfordshire
LU7 2UA
Phone:
01525375753
Website:

No information available