CUBITT ARTISTS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Proprietors of Studio and Art Galleries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 October 1995: Standard registration
- CUBITT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Horton | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Knowland | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Mary Rinebold | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fouad Kanaan | Trustee | 20 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raja Moussaoui | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Cork | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
KAILA SIMMONDS | Trustee | 17 December 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £357.83k | £395.19k | £319.98k | £376.38k | £432.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £442.41k | £306.05k | £266.20k | £371.38k | £390.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.44k | £9.62k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 May 2024 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1995, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ART GALLERY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cubitt Artists Ltd
8 Angel Mews
LONDON
N1 9HH
- Phone:
- 02072788226
- Email:
- info@cubittartists.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window