Accounts and annual returns ST MATTHEW'S PLAY GROUP (STRETFORD)

Charity Number: 1049657
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2005 16 May 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2004 27 July 2005 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required