Accounts and annual returns CHRIST REVIVAL MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity number: 1049674
Charity reporting is overdue by 1774 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 313 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 679 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1044 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 May 2024 1056 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 May 2024 1056 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1774 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1774 days