CHRIST REVIVAL MINISTRIES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Faith, to relieve persons who are in conditions of need or hardship or who are aged or sick, to fulfil such other charitable purposes beneficial to the community in London and other such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the trustees may from time to time think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 October 1995: Standard registration
- CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (REVIVAL CENTRE) (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bamidele Longe | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pastor OLUFEMI PETER OLUTAYO | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bukola Seun Oyeyemi Babatunde | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
SOBAYO LADI SOYEMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.51k | £37.78k | £31.58k | £35.66k | £50.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.99k | £40.33k | £29.63k | £31.49k | £49.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 688 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1053 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1053 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2024 | 1056 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 May 2024 | 1056 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1783 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1783 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 1ST AUGUST 1995
Charitable objects
(A)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE OF THE DEED IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (B)TO RELEIVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (C)TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 WARRIOR CLOSE
LONDON
SE28 0NL
- Phone:
- 07958946768
- Email:
- LONDON@CACREVIVALCENTRE.ORG
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window