Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CHERNOBYL'S CHILDREN (UK)

Charity Number: 1049689
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 05 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 05 February 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2017 26 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 12 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required