SIFA FIRESIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SIFA Fireside is the main day centre for homeless and vulnerably-housed adults in Birmingham. We provide a range of services to prevent homelessness and to support adults who are homeless or vulnerable by meeting their immediate and long-term needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,546,665
Donations and legacies | £428.80k | |
Charitable activities | £1.10m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £22.05k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,406,756
Raising funds | £106.33k | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £627,310 from 7 government contract(s) and £127,317 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £106.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.30m | |
Retained for future use | £139.91k |
People

35 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 10 October 1995: Standard registration
- SIFA SUPPORTING INDEPENDANCE FROM ALCOHOL (Working name)
- SIFA (SUPPORTING INDEPENDENCE FROM ALCOHOL) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Wakely | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Young | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Groom | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Holly Pyke | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Partridge | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN LAURENCE CHIDGEY | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE DEBORAH WILDMAN | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN OLLIER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19m | £1.65m | £1.48m | £1.57m | £1.55m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04m | £1.17m | £1.48m | £1.67m | £1.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £277.01k | £522.65k | £538.81k | £546.00k | £627.31k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £198.19k | £165.45k | £236.55k | £127.32k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £487.02k | £584.59k | £459.15k | £467.42k | £428.80k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £698.35k | £1.06m | £1.02m | £1.10m | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £486 | £258 | £121 | £4.86k | £22.05k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £954.04k | £1.05m | £1.33m | £1.50m | £1.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £81.95k | £112.24k | £150.46k | £165.37k | £106.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.90k | £36.62k | £39.45k | £42.22k | £40.53k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £336.73k | £343.98k | £347.28k | £305.12k | £285.31k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £657.86k | £1.07m | £1.02m | £1.06m | £1.23m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £260.50k | £198.00k | £165.99k | £260.65k | £270.31k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 AUGUST 1995 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2003, 4 SEPTEMBER 2003, 3 FEBRUARY 2004, 25 JULY 2007 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 6 AUGUST 2007 as amended on 18 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE EXPERIENCING HOMELESSNESS, VULNERABILITY AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION BY PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, INCLUSION, ENGAGEMENT AND EQUAL ACCESS TO SERVICES FOR SUCH PERSONS, INFLUENCING THE STRATEGIC DEVELOPMENT OF THE HOMELESSNESS AGENDA AND EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC AS TO THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sifa Fireside
48-52 Allcock Street
BIRMINGHAM
B9 4DY
- Phone:
- 0121 766 1700
- Email:
- office@sifafireside.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window