Connection Support

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our team of staff members and volunteers work alongside people to overcome the challenges they face in life. We do this to work towards our ultimate goal of solving homelessness and helping people achieve independence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,640,997
Donations and legacies | £668.38k | |
Charitable activities | £7.96m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £16.50k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,377,336
Raising funds | £51.21k | |
Charitable activities | £8.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£10,056 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £6,685,321 from 16 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £51.21k | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.33m | |
Retained for future use | £263.66k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £51.21k | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.33m | |
Retained for future use | £273.72k |
People

198 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 October 1995: Standard registration
- 20 April 2016: Funds received from 1087717 HOUSING INTERACTION TRUST
- 03 April 2019: Funds received from 1090715 PADSTONES HOUSING
- 14 August 2023: Funds received from 1093521 THE FACE OF HENLEY
- 18 December 2024: Funds received from 1067726 BANBURY DISTRICT HOUSING COALITION
- CONNECTION OXFORD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michaela Clark | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Barbara Dawson | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gerald Collingwood | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jack Bayley | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rumbidzai Takundwa | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Catherine Amura | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Aston | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Duke | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Wortley | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Allman | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.75m | £5.86m | £7.51m | £8.58m | £8.64m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.64m | £5.76m | £7.34m | £8.22m | £8.38m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £5.43m | £6.04m | £6.69m | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.13m | £4.16m | £30.93k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £29.34k | £168.66k | £207.90k | £278.12k | £668.38k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.45m | £5.35m | £7.30m | £8.18m | £7.96m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.53k | £1.25k | £0 | £1.65k | £16.50k | |
|
Income - Other | £266.97k | £333.07k | £0 | £130.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.63m | £5.74m | £7.29m | £8.15m | £8.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £12.54k | £18.09k | £53.09k | £45.26k | £51.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.92k | £6.02k | £9.77k | £12.90k | £12.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £16.96k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £378.88k | £406.34k | £392.25k | £554.77k | £706.40k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.05m | £2.21m | £2.41m | £2.87m | £2.92m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £402.86k | £493.44k | £522.67k | £774.66k | £698.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JUNE 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 SEPTMEBER 1995. as amended on 24 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN PEOPLE OVER THE AGE OF 16 AND LIVING, OR ABOUT TO LIVE, IN LOCAL AUTHORITY, HOUSING ASSOCIATION OR PRIVATE ACCOMMODATION (PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN IN CARE OR HAVE BEEN HOMELESS, THOSE WHO SUFFER FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND THOSE WITH PREVIOUS OR CURRENT ADDICTION TO DRUGS OR ALCOHOL) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND ADVOCACY SERVICES, COUNSELLING SUPPORT AND WHATEVER CHARITABLE MEANS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old School
First Turn
Wolvercote
Oxford
OX2 8AH
- Phone:
- 01865711267
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window