Accounts and annual returns ROCHESTER WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1049757
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 30 July 2024 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 05 April 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required