THE PARALEGAL CHARITY FOR THE SPONSORSHIP OF LEGAL EDUCATION, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND ADVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRAINING THE UNEMPLOYED & OTHER TRAINEES TO BE LAWYERS THEREBY ALLOWING FANTASTIC OPPORTUNITIES FOR SOCIAL MOBILITY/PROGRESSION AS TRAINEES CAN TRAIN TO BE A LAWYER IN JUST 1 OR 2 YEARS WHICH MAKES IT THE FASTEST WAY & MOST COST EFFECTIVE WAY (UP TO 80% CHEAPER) TO TRAIN TO BE A LAWYER IN THE UK. LEGAL & OTHER EDUCATIONAL TRAINING. LEGAL SERVICES & CAREERS ADVICE/JOBSEARCH PROVISION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 October 1995: Standard registration
- 28 August 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE PARALEGAL CHARITY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.91k | £51.66k | £65.45k | £65.65k | £63.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.70k | £52.69k | £63.44k | £62.77k | £62.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 25 AUGUST 1995
Charitable objects
1.TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH TRAINING IN PARALEGAL SKILLS WHICH ASSIST THEM IN OBTAINING EMPLOYMENT 2) TO PROVIDE FREE LERGAL ADVICE TO PEOPLE WHO BECAUSE OF THEIR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE PRIVATELY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window