THE SANDBACH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1049796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide local news USB Memory Sticks each week to the blind and partially sighted in our area.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £750
Total expenditure: £5,133

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 October 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SANDBACH AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Hind Chair 15 June 2021
None on record
Kay Hind Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £2.13k £1.81k £1.72k £750 £750
Total expenditure £7.27k £4.33k £5.25k £4.80k £5.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 21 April 2024 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
70 LEWIN STREET
MIDDLEWICH
CW10 9AS
Phone:
01606833408