HASTINGS BONFIRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity undertakes collections of donations from the public which are distributed as grants to charitable organisations, provides manpower, equipment and other resources to other charitable organisations in furtherance of the charity's objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- East Sussex
Governance
- 17 October 1995: Standard registration
- HBT (Working name)
- HASTINGS BOROUGH BONFIRE SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Leach | Chair | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY DAVID PHILIP SOLOMON | Trustee | 13 December 2016 |
|
|||||
Claire Mary Ann Grace Bridges | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|||||
REGINALD WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.10k | £0 | £8.33k | £5.26k | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.85k | £2.89k | £6.12k | £5.77k | £5.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 March 2024 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 26 SEPTEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 16 DECEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE HEREINAFTER CONSTITUTED SHALL DETERMINE .
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED -- IN PRACTICE HASTINGS AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hastings Voluntary Action
Jackson Hall
Portland Place
Hastings
TN34 1QN
- Phone:
- 01424584560
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window