Financial history TUNBRIDGE WELLS MENTAL HEALTH RESOURCE LIMITED

Charity number: 1049854
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £412.69k £400.70k £414.38k £437.91k £483.18k
Total expenditure £392.81k £361.22k £399.43k £438.82k £456.73k
Income from government contracts £246.51k £212.26k £221.13k £241.72k £236.99k
Income from government grants N/A £2.71k £2.00k £8.13k N/A