Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BROADMEADOW NURSERY SPECIAL SCHOOL

Charity number: 1049863
Charity reporting is up to date (66 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 04 September 2024 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 07 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 14 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 14 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window