Financial history THE BREAST CANCER SURVIVAL TRUST

Charity number: 1049884
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.87k £2.66k £5.98k £5.98k £2.79k
Total expenditure £9.28k £600 £780 £780 £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A