THE FRIENDS OF ST JOHN'S CATERHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to maintain or enhance the building and fixtures and fittings of St. John's Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 October 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PENNY VENESS | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Court | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JAMES HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.68k | £2.35k | £1.17k | £4.63k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.94k | £532 | £4.00k | £1.40k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 572 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 937 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 937 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO FACILITATE THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST CATERHAM VALLEY ITS MONUMENTS FIXTURES FITTINGS FURNITURE ORGAN STAINED GLASS ORNNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT IT AS A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE CATERHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 CRESCENT ROAD
CATERHAM
CR3 6LE
- Phone:
- 01883344136
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window