PETER STORMONTH DARLING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity donates money, potentially worldwide, to nationally registered charities who work in the areas of medical research, sport and education, conservation and heritage, culture and veterans' support and commemoration. We cannot accept applications by post or by telephone. All electronic submissions will be reviewed but a response may only be given if further information is required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Canada
- China
- Croatia
- Romania
- Scotland
- Tanzania
- United States
Governance
- 18 October 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CANDIS CHRISTA TAYLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Frederick David Stewart Rosier | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr ELIZABETH IONA COBB | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Justin Cobb | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angus Stormonth Darling | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £281.96k | £237.09k | £311.84k | £307.78k | £285.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.93k | £237.09k | £352.18k | £345.76k | £319.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 2ND OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
(A)FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FOUNDER MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BY A NOTICE DIRECT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT WHERE THE FOUNDER HAS NOT BY THE 5TH APRIL IN THE INCOME TAX YEAR FOLLOWING THAT IN WHICH THE INCOME ARISES GIVEN A DIRECTION WHICH FULLY DISPOSES OF THE INCOME THEN SUCH INCOME SHALL BE DISPOSED OF IN ACCORDANCE WITH SUBCLAUSE (B) (B)SUBJECT TO AND IN DEFAULT OF ANY SUCH DIRECTION AND INSOFAR AS ANY SUCH DIRECTION IS NOT EXHAUSTIVE TO APPLY THE INCOME FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME IN ANY OF THE AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHT OF THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 LANSDOWN CRESCENT
BATH
BA1 5EX
- Phone:
- 0000 0000
- Email:
- secretary@thepsdtrust.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window