Financial history ROMANBY COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1049960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.44k £3.03k £3.95k £12.99k £10.16k
Total expenditure £7.03k £3.73k £5.58k £10.37k £11.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A