BRIDGE CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing counselling for a wide range of problems. Providing accredited FE training in counselling/ christian counselling and pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
- Cardiff
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Torfaen
Governance
- 17 October 1995: Standard registration
- BCCC (Working name)
- BRIDGE CCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Louise Worthing | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Stuart Thompson | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Paula Thompson | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND CHRISTOPHER JOHN WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE ELIZABETH LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.26k | £4.93k | £5.45k | £4.81k | £3.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.55k | £2.99k | £3.90k | £3.94k | £7.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 June 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY A) THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING SERVICES TO THOSE PERSONS IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR SICKNESS HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS B) THE PROVISION OFTRAINING IN COUNSELLING C) PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE GWENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIDGE CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING CENTRE
C/O GAER CHRISTIAN CENTRE
GAER PARK DRIVE
NEWPORT
SOUTH WALES
NP20 3NN
- Phone:
- 01633258729
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window