Financial history The Timothy Tacchi and Betina Kunzl-Tacchi Charitable Trust

Charity number: 1049998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £86.82k £0 £0 £1.49k £379
Total expenditure £55.00k £2.03k £0 £0 £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A