North West Kent Phab Club

Charity number: 1050025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Social events - trips etc

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,212
Total expenditure: £9,129

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 October 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • P H A B (Working name)
  • GRAVESHAM AND DARTFORD PHAB CLUB (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ZOE LEANNE WEBBER Trustee 27 February 2019
None on record
Christopher John Keeble Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
RITA HUNTER Trustee
None on record
EILEEN ELIZABETH PERKS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.86k £5.29k £2.80k £6.82k £10.21k
Total expenditure £9.97k £4.77k £2.73k £7.60k £9.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
177 SINGLEWELL ROAD
GRAVESEND
DA11 7RB
Phone:
01474568655
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available