Old Hutton PTA

Charity Number: 1050026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Coffee mornings, Summer fete, Sports night, Auction of promises, Family disco, jumble sales and similar events.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £10,033
Total expenditure: £5,878

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 October 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • OLD HUTTON HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kristi Louise Pillans Chair 02 November 2023
None on record
Caroline alison Derbyshire Trustee 02 November 2023
None on record
Harriet Victoria Gilding Trustee 02 November 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.98k £1.18k £4.58k £7.47k £10.03k
Total expenditure £4.14k £1.30k £3.16k £8.30k £5.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PTA Old Hutton C OF E School
Old Hutton
Kendal
LA8 0NQ
Phone:
01539773620
Website:

No information available