Financial history WAPPING NOORANI MASJID AND CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1050036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £50.02k £8.16k £68.94k £62.81k £66.21k
Total expenditure £16.27k £10.08k £64.98k £43.06k £43.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A