Linked charities CHESHIRE AND WIRRAL PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST GENERAL FUND
Charity number: 1050046

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
- ASHTON HOUSE HOSPITAL FUND
- CHESHIRE AND WIRRAL PARTNERSHIP NHS FOUNDATION TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- EAST CHESHIRE MENTAL HEALTH, LEARNING DISABILITIES AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES FUND
- MID CHESHIRE MENTAL HEALTH, LEARNING DISABILITIES AND ASSOCIATED SERVICES FUND
- PRIMARY CARE FUND
- ST CATHERINES HOSPITAL FUND
- THE MARJORIE VERA MARSHALL BURSARY
- VICTORIA CENTRAL HOSPITAL FUND
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 04/06/1997, 25/4/2002 AND 31/10/2007
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE WHOLLY OR MAINLY FOR ASHTON HOUSE HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 11 October 1996 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.