Accounts and annual returns FFYNNON TAF PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1050097
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 11 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 11 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 11 September 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 11 September 2004 12 September 2005 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 September 2004 Not Required