HUNTINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1050113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

providing village hall facilities for the village of huntington and surrounding area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £4,023
Total expenditure: £2,719

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire
  • Powys

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gaenor Charlotte Luscombe Trustee 29 November 2021
None on record
ruth elizabeth griffiths Trustee 18 February 2021
None on record
Gordon Meakins Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
joanna hammond Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Christine Meakins Trustee 30 September 2015
None on record
fiona elizabeth shone Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
sandra jones Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
BARRY JAMES Trustee
None on record
PIPPA LLOYD Trustee
None on record
Dr GEOFFREY STEEL Trustee
None on record
COLIN JONES Trustee
None on record
PAULINE WALKER Trustee
None on record
CAROLE STEVENSON Trustee
None on record
PETER WALKER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £11.33k £18.31k £1.76k £3.68k £4.02k
Total expenditure £1.88k £11.80k £2.67k £2.01k £2.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.43k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 06 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 05 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 16 August 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Yew Tree Cottage
Huntington
KINGTON
HR5 3PF
Phone:
01544370215
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available