THE WALTER EVANS PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises money for the benefit of Walter Evans School, buying equipment and funding projects requested by the school to further the education and well being of its pupils and staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 24 October 1995: Standard registration
- WALTER EVANS PARENTS,TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (PFTA) (Working name)
- THE WALTER EVANS PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE WALTER PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Richardson | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Seal | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Laurence Wright Mr | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.48k | £11.76k | £12.80k | £17.39k | £14.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.85k | £3.80k | £14.20k | £4.65k | £11.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 April 2025 | 316 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 06 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEP 1995 AS AMENDED ON 08 OCT 1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 OCT 2021 as amended on 14 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: - DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; - ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
WALTER EVANS C OF E SCHOOL
DARLEY ABBEY DRIVE
DARLEY ABBEY
DERBY
DE22 1EF
- Phone:
- 01332 557139
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window