HEADLANDS COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Income/Expenditure for School visits and visitors to school Swimming, sports coaching and subsidies for children when voluntary contributions have not been received Subscriptions to Sports Associations and other bodies Collections and donations to other Charities Income and Expenditure for Book Club, Revision books and Clubs Uniform sales profits Purchase of curriculum enrichment resources
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 25 October 1995: Standard registration
- 05 May 2023: Funds received from 1164520 HEADLANDS OUT OF SCHOOL CLUB
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clare Ahmad | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Harrison | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Pearson | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Pearson | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Hare | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Louise Pearce | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH NEVILLE | Trustee | 27 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Rev RONALD ERIC SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLLR IAN CUTHBERTSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.26k | £1.17k | £23.38k | £29.37k | £7.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.56k | £1.12k | £23.99k | £27.45k | £7.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF HEADLANDS SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HEADLANDS PRIMARY SCHOOL
OAK TREE LANE
HAXBY
YORK
YO32 2YH
- Phone:
- 01904762356
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window