Financial history AUDIENCES CENTRAL

Charity number: 1050167
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £877.20k £1.26m £567.22k £619.18k £715.71k
Total expenditure £843.35k £1.25m £556.74k £711.60k £611.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £250.96k £229.88k £308.32k £222.71k £227.58k
Income - Other trading activities £46.77k £595.53k £97.60k £52.92k £63.32k
Income - Charitable activities £578.04k £431.01k £152.81k £343.48k £424.79k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.42k £6.93k £8.48k £69 £25
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £806.15k £684.38k £418.07k £622.57k £533.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £10.92k £7.52k £23.25k £10.19k £7.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0