THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. GEORGE, BENENDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance in the maintenance and management of the fabric of the Parish Church of St. George, Benenden, and its Churchyard, in the Diocese of Canterbury, and to preserve and protect it as a place of Christian worship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 27 October 1995: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF ST GEORGES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN ANDREW PEXTON BA MBA | Chair | 24 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Laura Gardner | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER FRANCIS GRAVES PARKINSON | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|||||
ERICA JUDITH MONTCHAL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ANN JENKINS | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MS JO CLUBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.38k | £4.60k | £3.28k | £4.55k | £7.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £1.97k | £1.06k | £11.65k | £1.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8TH AUGUST 1985
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. GEORGE, AND ITS CHURCHYARD AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT IT AS A PLACE OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP.
Area of benefit
BENENDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Kensham
Sandhurst Lane
Rolvenden
Cranbrook
Kent
TN17 4PH
- Phone:
- 01580 241394
- Email:
- pextonmartin@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window