Financial history THE METANOIA INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1050175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £3.79m £4.46m £5.42m £5.18m £5.96m
Total expenditure £3.67m £4.31m £4.87m £5.52m £5.72m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £511 £360 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.78m £4.45m £5.42m £5.17m £5.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.59k £14.52k £6.27k £9.41k £49.96k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £144.44k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.67m £4.30m £4.86m £5.52m £5.72m
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.18k £11.27k £3.70k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £15.32k £14.03k £27.98k £27.05k £27.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £99.52k £104.63k £126.49k £215.06k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0