UXBRIDGE CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
What does your charity: Arts/Culture; Who does the charity help: general public. mankind; Where does the charity operate: London Borough of Hillingdon. 40 mixed-voice Uxbridge Choral Society. 3 public performances each year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 27 October 1995: Standard registration
- UX CHOR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ariane Charlebois | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michele Gillian Needleman | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Louise Strach | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MEGAN LEWIS | Trustee | 05 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER BARBARA SKINNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.85k | £14.58k | £6.05k | £18.18k | £14.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.38k | £14.12k | £6.05k | £14.24k | £23.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/10/1995 AS AMENDED ON 03 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF SCIENCE AND MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
242 Cowley Road
UXBRIDGE
Middlesex
UB8 2NH
- Phone:
- 07887790167
- Email:
- acfuzz@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
uxbridgechoralsociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window