Financial history GIGGLESWICK PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1050187
Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £17.26k £12.84k £14.30k £3.60k £11.20k
Total expenditure £13.28k £10.86k £14.26k £2.37k £7.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A