HALWIN TRIPLE TREE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a Pre School between Carnkie and Porkellis villages, adjacent to the Primary School. We can take up to 21 children per session and run 5 -7 sessions a week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 26 October 1995: Standard registration
- 23 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 23 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1085482 FRIENDS OF HALWIN SCHOOL
- HALWIN COMMUNITY PRE SCHOOL (Working name)
- HALWIN COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- PLAYAWAY UNDER 5'S PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.01k | £43.43k | £42.31k | £55.55k | £41.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.68k | £40.13k | £39.78k | £50.89k | £56.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £31.70k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 19 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 19 November 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 21 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
21 November 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MARCH 1995, AS AMENDED ON 3RD OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window