THE AMBLESIDE AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Self help activities of a social and educational nature under the umbrella of the parent organisation The Third Age Trust
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cumbria
Governance
- 26 October 1995: Standard registration
- AMBLESIDE AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Isherwood | Chair | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Cole | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frances Jean Green | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Harvey | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Anne Rudd | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Huggins | Trustee | 07 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Traynier | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.22k | £4.52k | £14.63k | £17.83k | £15.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.76k | £3.97k | £14.58k | £18.40k | £14.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 SEPTEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED 22 SEPTEMBER 1997, 28 SEPTEMBER 1998, 27TH SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 2000. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
AMBLESIDE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tomsteads
Woodland
BROUGHTON-IN-FURNESS
Cumbria
LA20 6DG
- Phone:
- 07442407736
- Email:
- amblesideu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window