MOULSECOOMB ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 26 October 1995: Standard registration
- 30 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH SEPTEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUPPLEMENTARY RESOURCES TO THE PLAYGROUND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN MOULSECOOMB,BEING FACILITIES: OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES;AND WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL,MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-- IN PRACTICE MOULSECOOMB
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window