Accounts and annual returns FELTON SCHOOL FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1050208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 02 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 02 May 2025 276 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 16 May 2023 290 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required