Financial history BUSY BEES PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1050224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £181.47k £227.23k £165.60k £150.73k £153.16k
Total expenditure £163.84k £215.96k £199.47k £153.76k £145.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £128.83k
Income from government grants £2.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A