THE MACAULAY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 October 1995: Standard registration
- 09 June 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 November 2011: Re-registered
- MACAULAY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Robert Parry | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas George Balls | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Christopher Hammock | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Christine Eade | Trustee | 04 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Dilworth | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £5.16k | £12.80k | £10.70k | £14.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.50k | £12.66k | £9.32k | £14.18k | £5.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 September 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
CLAPHAM, SOUTH LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
MACAULAY C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
VICTORIA RISE
LONDON
SW4 0NU
- Phone:
- 07905870228
- Email:
- dilworths@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window