FRIENDS OF ST MARYS SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to advance the education of the pupils of St Mary's Catholic School, Bishop's Stortford, and in particular to raise the capital funds required for the provision of new buildings or the improvement of existing buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 27 October 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Carroll | Chair | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tom Johnston | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie Cockerton | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WOJCIK KAZIMIERZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £63.96k | £56.49k | £54.03k | £75.60k | £63.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £85.93k | £70.00k | £66.78k | £92.65k | £52.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2022 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2022 | 235 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18TH OCTOBER 1995 AS AMENDED 22ND FEB 1999
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF ST MARYS SCHOOL, BISHOPS STORTFORD IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORDSHIRE
Area of benefit
BISHOPS STORTFORD, HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARYS CATHOLIC SCHOOL
WINDHILL
BISHOP'S STORTFORD
CM23 2NQ
- Phone:
- 01279654901
- Email:
- info@stmarys.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window