FRIENDS OF SWINDON MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising and support for the Swindon Museum and Art Gallery, yearly cycle of Talks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 30 October 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Mark Cross | Chair | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Gomez | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Grace George | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antonia Gay Holt | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marie Parsons | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Styles | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Angela Maureen Atkinson | Trustee | 28 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brigid Catherine Harkness | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Yeldham-Savage | Trustee | 31 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Linda Kasmaty | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.73k | £4.41k | £3.72k | £4.49k | £3.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.83k | £1.19k | £1.69k | £1.86k | £2.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION SUPPORT ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF SWINDON MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF A GROUP OF FRIENDS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE SWINDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 St. Margaret's Road
Swindon
SN3 1RX
- Phone:
- 01793527149
- Email:
- lindakasmaty@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window