Trustees FRIENDS OF SWINDON MUSEUM AND ART GALLERY

Charity number: 1050267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Mark Cross Chair 05 December 2024
None on record
Carl Gomez Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Helen Grace George Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Antonia Gay Holt Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Claire Marie Parsons Trustee 05 December 2024
None on record
Martin Styles Trustee 24 January 2022
DASH - DISCOVERING AUTISTIC SPECTRUM HAPPINESS
Received: On time
Angela Maureen Atkinson Trustee 28 November 2020
None on record
Brigid Catherine Harkness Trustee 26 November 2020
None on record
Rosemary Yeldham-Savage Trustee 31 October 2015
None on record
Linda Kasmaty Trustee 05 November 2014
None on record