DURSLEY CAM AND WOTTON NEW LIFE CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We 1. Preach the Gospel of Jesus Christ to all and sundry. 2. Engage in a variety of Christian activities. 3. Assist individuals suffering poverty. 4. Counsel prisoners with their varied needs. 5. Help to finance students. All these activities are channelled through the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 31 October 1995: Standard registration
- 22 November 2013: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 22 November 2013: Funds transferred to 1131467 ONE CHURCH
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.50k | £11.50k | £12.18k | £10.53k | £8.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.65k | £12.65k | £13.38k | £18.74k | £13.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 05 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 12 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 19 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 08 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 18 November 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/11/1993 AS AMENDED ON 05/06/2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE DURSLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window