THE POWERPACK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's aim is the training and resourcing of children and children's leaders worldwide, particularly in the context of Christian churches. The Trust's work continues to be in increasing demand, both in this country and overseas, particularly in Argentina, where local leaders are embracing and developing the vision.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Burma
- Italy
- Thailand
- United States
Governance
- 31 October 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA JANE BRACKLEY | Chair | 10 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN LOUISE CAUSEBROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR KEN CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA VERONICA CUNNINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA SUSAN HERRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.27k | £47.25k | £49.27k | £40.17k | £34.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.60k | £33.89k | £34.71k | £40.93k | £41.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.34k | £3.57k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Powerpack Trust
1 Walpole House
Pickford Street
ALDERSHOT
GU11 1TZ
- Phone:
- 01252314639
- Email:
- info@ppcentre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window