MAHARAJA DULEEP SINGH CENTENARY TRUST

Charity number: 1050329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

MDSCT's work includes exhibitions, seminars, workshops, lectures, research projects, publications, theatre, educational materials and online resources which all help to raise awareness of and highlight and preserve the significant Sikh and Anglo Sikh Heritage that exists in the UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £5,568
Total expenditure: £5,502

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ANGLO SIKH HERITAGE TRAIL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
D S SIDHU Trustee
None on record
YADWINDER SINGH SUMRAY Trustee
None on record
Jasbir Boparai Trustee
None on record
J S NAGRA Trustee
None on record
R S SOMAL Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £8.62k £11.36k £6.50k £7.66k £5.57k
Total expenditure £8.09k £9.28k £1.21k £2.07k £5.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 20 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 August 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Limes
5 Birmingham Road
Walsall
WS1 2LT
Phone:
01922721504